+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 27, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
- ED - Majority; do pass.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 15).
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor