+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Rules.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor