+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 187, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- HLTC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor