+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor