+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 311, 2019 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor