+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 215, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House receded from amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM.
- HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 13).
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
+ − Amendments (3)
5267-S2 AMS BECK S2203.1
ADOPTED 03/13/2013
5267-S2.E AMH HCW H2223.1
ADOPTED 04/11/2013
5267-S2.E AMH CODY H2523.1
ADOPTED 04/24/2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor