+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care. (View Original Bill)