+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 138, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 9:00 AM.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- GOE - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:30 AM.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- GOV - Majority; do pass.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor