+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 10/19/2017.
- Chapter 15, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSMH - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor