+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On June 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 4.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Rules suspended.
On June 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 13).
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Amendments (5)
5242-S AMS LITZ S2896.3
ADOPTED 06/09/2013
5242-S AMS MULL WOLF 021
NOT ADOPTED 03/06/2013
5242-S AMS LITZ S2896.2
PULLED 06/08/2013
5242-S AMS FROC S2061.2
NOT ADOPTED 03/06/2013
5242-S AMS MCAU S1831.1
NOT ADOPTED 03/06/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor