+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor