+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CLS 17). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)