+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor