+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
+ − Amendments (3)
5226 AMS KEIS S2502.1
NOT CONSIDERED 03/10/2015
5226 AMS KOHL NICH 064
NOT ADOPTED 03/10/2015
5226 AMS HASE NICH 082
ADOPTED 03/10/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor