+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 235, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor