+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.
+ − Amendments (9)
5222-S AMS NELS S4782.1
PULLED 02/16/2016
5222-S AMS NELS S4781.1
PULLED 02/16/2016
5222-S AMS MULL S4202.2
PULLED 02/16/2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor