+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LBRC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)