+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)