+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 261, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House receded from amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted as amended.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 13).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
+ − Amendments (6)
5213-S2 AMH CODY H2475.2
ADOPTED 04/24/2013
5213-S2 AMH HCW BLAC 052
NOT CONSIDERED 04/16/2013
5213-S2 AMH HCW BLAC 053
NOT CONSIDERED 04/16/2013
5213-S2 AMH APP H2368.1
ADOPTED AS AMENDED 04/16/2013
5213-S2 AMH ALEX BLAC 064
ADOPTED 04/16/2013
5213-S2 AMH ENGR H2368.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 04/16/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor