+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor