+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)