+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- NRP - Majority; do pass.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 2:00 PM.
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor