+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor