+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 233, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- CB - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Education.
- CB - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Capital Budget.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 13).
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Amendments (2)
5197-S2 AMH ED H2260.2
NOT CONSIDERED 04/15/2013
5197-S2 AMH CB H2371.1
ADOPTED 04/15/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor