+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)