+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Corrections. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSC - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSMH - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor