+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.