+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CLS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)