+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date 4/22/2021.
- Chapter 115, 2021 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
- Motion to not concur in House amendments failed.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Housing, Human Services & Veterans. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- HHSV - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 21). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. (View Original Bill)