+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 184, 2021 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- RDAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- AWNP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor