+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor