+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 3, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 349, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 29, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- CRJ - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (HSRR 20). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (Majority Report)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSRR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
- WM - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (View Original Bill)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.