+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 292, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Environment & Energy. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ENET 19). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor