+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Children, Youth & Families. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CYF - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HSRR 21). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (View Original Bill)
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.