+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 314, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)