+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Transportation.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- SGTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor