+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass TRED 13 bill proposed by Trade & Economic Development.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 5:30 PM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor