+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 157, 2013 Laws.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- TR - Majority; do pass.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FIHI 13).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance.
- And refer to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance.
- TRAN - Majority; without recommendation.
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Amendment
5095-S AMS ROAC REDM 010
ADOPTED 02/20/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor