+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date 5/18/2021.
- Chapter 334, 2021 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Conference committee report adopted.
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Conference committee report adopted.
On April 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report; received 1:45 PM 4/24/2021.
On April 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Representatives Gregerson, Ormsby; Senators Robinson, Rolfes.
- Conference committee report; received 1:27 PM 4/24/2021.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed. Representatives Gregerson, Ormsby, Stokesbary.
- Conference committee request granted.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed. Senators Rolfes, Wilson, L., Robinson.
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon.
On April 3, 2021 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor