+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 387, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Education. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Vote on final passage will be reconsidered.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.