+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Effective date 1/1/2024.
- Chapter 266, 2023 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 24, 2023 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
- CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAW 23). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)
On December 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor