+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 10:00 AM.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- GOSS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor