+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 143, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- SGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- SGTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. (View Original Bill)
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.