+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAW 15).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor