+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- FIHI - Majority; do pass.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor