+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 6/1/2014.
- Chapter 130, 2014 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- APPG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Public Safety.
- APPG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- PS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (HSC 14).
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HSC - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:30 PM.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice .
+ − Amendment
5064-S2 AMH PS H4390.1
ADOPTED 03/07/2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor