+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 172, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted as amended.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (GOS 15).
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
5048-S.E AMH TAKK MOET 792
ADOPTED 04/13/2015
5048-S.E AMH ENGR H2385.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 04/13/2015
5048-S.E AMH LG H2385.2
ADOPTED AS AMENDED 04/13/2015
5048-S AMS ROAC S2552.2
ADOPTED 03/11/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor