+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 32, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- BFS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- FI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor