+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 31, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- JUDI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor