+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 107, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor